WI SB812 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Published 3-19-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0440 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of certain electric fences.
Title
Regulation of certain electric fences.
Sponsors
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. John Jagler [R] | Sen. Jesse James [R] |
Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Published 3-19-2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-18-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 197 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-15-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:57 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senator Bewley added as a coauthor |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Introduced |