WI SB785 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 238.15 (3) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: transferring the angel investment tax credit. (FE)
Title
Transferring the angel investment tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Feyen |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Introduced |