WI SB756 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.52 (2) (a) 2. a.; and to create 77.52 (2) (a) 2. d. of the statutes; Relating to: a sales tax exemption for sales of admissions to the Wisconsin State Fair at State Fair Park. (FE)
Title
A sales tax exemption for sales of admissions to the Wisconsin State Fair at State Fair Park. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture and Tourism, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-12-08 | Senate | Introduced |