WI SB754 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.045 (2) (c), 302.05 (3) (a) 1., 302.113 (9g) (b) (intro.), 973.01 (3g) and 973.01 (3m); and to create 304.02 (1m) and 973.09 (3) (d) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Title
Earned release from parole or extended supervision and discharge from probation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb754 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB754.pdf |