WI SB750 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (1) (mu); and to create 29.063 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: deer carcass disposal sites, chronic wasting disease education, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Deer carcass disposal sites, chronic wasting disease education, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Representative Stubbs added as a cosponsor |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Small Business and Rural Issues |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced |