WI SB735 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 14.16 (17) of the statutes; Relating to: creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.
Title
Creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senator Bernier added as a coauthor |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb735 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB735.pdf |