WI SB72 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 940.198 (1) (a) and 971.109 (1) (a); to renumber and amend 939.623 (1); to amend 343.12 (7) (c) 9j., 813.12 (5b), 813.123 (6g), 813.125 (5b), 911.01 (4) (c), 939.623 (title), 939.623 (2) (intro.), 939.623 (3), 940.198 (title), 940.198 (1) (b), 940.198 (2) (a), 940.198 (2) (b), 940.198 (2) (c), 940.198 (3) (a), 940.198 (3) (b), 940.198 (3) (c), 940.198 (4), 971.109 (title), 971.109 (2) (a) and 971.109 (2) (c); and to create 813.12 (1) (ab), 813.125 (1) (am) 2., 939.623 (1) (b), 940.198 (1) (ag), 940.225 (1) (e) and 971.109 (1) (ac) of the statutes; Relating to: increased penalties for crimes against adults at risk; restraining orders for adults at risk; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an adult at risk; sexual assault of an adult at risk; and providing a penalty.
Title
Increased penalties for crimes against adults at risk; restraining orders for adults at risk; freezing assets of a defendant charged with financial exploitation of an adult at risk; sexual assault of an adult at risk; and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Read a second time |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced |