WI SB713 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (4) (av) and 93.60 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a food security grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a food security grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Representative Neubauer added as a cosponsor |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Representative Haywood added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Tourism |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |