WI SB701 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.20 (3) (a) and (bf) and 971.19 (2); and to create 943.20 (5) and (6) and 943.50 (6) and (7) of the statutes; Relating to: theft crimes and providing a penalty.
Title
Theft crimes and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Hutton |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators Hutton and Pfaff |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Introduced |