WI SB694 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-07 - Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor
Pending: Senate Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 14.16 (9r) of the statutes; Relating to: Veterans Education Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans Education Week.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-07SenateRepresentative Subeck added as a cosponsor
2023-12-06SenateRepresentative Neubauer added as a cosponsor
2023-11-27SenateRepresentatives Shankland and Haywood added as cosponsors
2023-11-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
2023-11-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback