WI SB640 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Fiscal estimate received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 6.86 (2), 6.865 (3) and 6.865 (3m) (c); to renumber 5.07; to renumber and amend 6.86 (2m), 7.52 (5), 7.52 (6) (a) and 7.52 (6) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 6.25 (4) (intro.), (a) and (b); to amend 5.05 (1) (e), 5.05 (1) (f), 5.05 (13) (title), 5.056, 5.06 (2), 5.25 (4) (b), 5.35 (6) (a) (intro.), 5.35 (6) (a) 5., 5.35 (6) (b), 5.35 (6) (c), 5.84 (1), 6.22 (4) (a), 6.22 (4) (e), 6.22 (6), 6.221 (1), 6.221 (3) (b), 6.24 (4) (c), 6.25 (1), 6.275 (1) (c), 6.275 (1) (d), 6.28 (1), 6.28 (4), 6.29 (1), 6.29 (2) (a), 6.29 (2) (b), 6.29 (2) (d), 6.33 (5) (a), 6.34 (2), 6.34 (3) (a) 7., 6.34 (3) (b) (intro.), 6.36 (1) (a), 6.36 (1) (b) 1. a., 6.36 (2) (a), 6.36 (2) (c), 6.54, 6.55 (title), 6.55 (2) (a) 1., 6.55 (2) (b), 6.55 (2) (c) 1. and 2., 6.55 (2) (cs), 6.55 (5), 6.79 (4), 6.855 (title), 6.855 (1), 6.855 (2), 6.86 (1) (a) (intro.), 6.86 (1) (a) 3., 6.86 (1) (ac), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.86 (1) (b), 6.86 (1) (c), 6.86 (3) (a), 6.86 (3) (c), 6.865 (title), 6.865 (3m) (a), 6.865 (3m) (b), 6.869, 6.87 (2) (intro.), 6.87 (3) (d), 6.87 (4), 6.87 (9), 6.875 (3), 6.875 (4) (a), 6.875 (6) (c) 1., 6.88 (3) (b), 6.88 (3) (c), 6.925, 6.93, 7.08 (1) (c), 7.15 (1) (cm), 7.15 (1) (j), 7.15 (2m), 7.15 (4), 7.41 (4), 7.51 (3) (d), 7.52 (3) (b), 7.52 (4) (i), 9.01 (1) (b) 2., 10.01 (2) (e), 12.09 (1) and (3), 12.13 (1) (b), 12.13 (1) (c), 12.13 (1) (d), 12.13 (2) (b) 3., 12.60 (1) (a), 12.60 (4), 85.61 (1), 939.50 (3) (d) and 939.50 (3) (e); to repeal and recreate 6.86 (1) (a) 3.; and to create 5.05 (13) (c) and (d), 5.05 (16), 5.07 (2), 5.25 (4) (c), 5.34, 5.35 (6) (a) 4c., 5.35 (6) (d), 6.22 (2) (e), 6.24 (4) (e), 6.256, 6.29 (2) (e), 6.34 (2n), 6.34 (3) (d), 6.34 (4), 6.36 (1) (bm), 6.86 (1) (ab), 6.86 (1) (ad), 6.86 (3) (d), 6.868, 6.87 (2m), 7.08 (3) (d) to (g), 7.08 (12), 7.08 (13), 7.10 (11), 7.15 (15), 12.17, 12.19, 12.60 (1) (am), 12.60 (1) (an), 12.60 (1) (ap), 12.60 (1) (bn) and 19.685 of the statutes; relating to: various changes in election laws, granting rule-making authority, and providing penalties.
Title
Various changes in election laws, granting rule-making authority, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-09 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-09 | Report passage as amended recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 4 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 3 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by joint committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 by joint committee on Finance | |
2010-04-07 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-06 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to joint committee on Finance by committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate substitute amendment 1 offered by Senator Coggs | |
2010-04-02 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-02 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 | |
2010-04-02 | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 by committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-04-02 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-31 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-03-31 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-24 | Senator Erpenbach added as a coauthor | |
2010-03-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Elections and Urban Affairs | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb640 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB640.pdf |