WI SB638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 348.15 (11); and to create 348.27 (9) (a) 3. g. and 348.27 (9) (a) 3. h. of the statutes; Relating to: vehicle weight limits, and permits for vehicles transporting certain loads, on certain state trunk highways in Ashland County and Vilas County. (FE)
Title
Vehicle weight limits, and permits for vehicles transporting certain loads, on certain state trunk highways in Ashland County and Vilas County. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Department of Transportation Vehicle report received pursuant to s.13.096, Wisconsin Statutes |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb638 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB638.pdf |