WI SB629 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 342.15 (3); and to create 895.491 of the statutes; Relating to: a liability exemption for motor vehicle sellers after sale.
Title
A liability exemption for motor vehicle sellers after sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Representative Emerson withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Representative Rettinger added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2023/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb629 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2023/REG/SB629.pdf |