WI SB624 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 70.32 (1); and to create 70.32 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting an assessor from changing the valuation of property based solely on a recent sale of the property. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting an assessor from changing the valuation of property based solely on a recent sale of the property. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Laid on table |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Representative Hutton added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Craig |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb624 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB624.pdf |