WI SB59 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Published 6-13-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-06 - Published 6-13-2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 30.12 (1k) (b) 3. of the statutes; relating to: the deadline for registering certain piers and wharves with the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
The deadline for registering certain piers and wharves with the Department of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Senate | Published 6-13-2011 |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 5-27-2011. 2011 Wisconsin Act 25 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 5-26-2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 5-13-2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2011-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-10 | House | Representative Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2011-05-10 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 87, Noes 7 |
2011-05-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-05-10 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-10 | House | Read a second time |
2011-05-10 | House | Rules suspended and taken up |
2011-05-10 | House | Read |
2011-05-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Read a second time |
2011-05-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 5-10-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources and Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senator Zipperer added as a coauthor |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Environment |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Introduced |