WI SB576 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.490 (3) (fq), 20.490 (3) (gq) and 234.665 of the statutes; Relating to: a revolving workforce home loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A revolving workforce home loan program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Introduced |