WI SB571 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.505 (8) (hm) 19., 20.835 (2) (dn), 20.835 (2) (ka), 20.835 (2) (q), 71.03 (2) (a) 3. and 4., 71.05 (6) (b) 47., 71.05 (22) (f) 1., 2. and 3., 71.07 (2), 71.07 (3m), 71.07 (8), 71.07 (9e) (a), (ac), (ad), (af), and (ah), 71.07 (9e) (ap) and (at), 71.07 (9e) (g), 71.10 (4) (b), 71.15 (2), 71.26 (2) (a) 10., 71.28 (2m), 71.28 (9s), 71.30 (3) (ex), 71.47 (2m), 71.47 (9s), 71.49 (1) (ex), 71.66 (2) (c) and (d), 79.13, 238.3995 and 569.02 (5); and to amend 71.03 (2) (a) 5., 71.07 (2dm) (a) 1., 71.07 (2dm) (a) 3., 71.07 (2dm) (f) 1., 71.07 (2dm) (j), 71.07 (2dm) (k), 71.07 (2dx) (a) 2., 71.07 (2dx) (b) (intro.), 71.07 (2dx) (c), 71.07 (2dx) (d), 71.07 (9e) (aj) (intro.), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.26 (2) (a) 4., 71.28 (1dm) (a) 1., 71.28 (1dm) (a) 3., 71.28 (1dm) (f) 1., 71.28 (1dm) (j), 71.28 (1dm) (k), 71.28 (1dx) (a) 2., 71.28 (1dx) (b) (intro.), 71.28 (1dx) (c), 71.28 (1dx) (d), 71.30 (3) (f), 71.45 (2) (a) 10., 71.47 (1dm) (a) 1., 71.47 (1dm) (a) 3., 71.47 (1dm) (f) 1., 71.47 (1dm) (j), 71.47 (1dm) (k), 71.47 (1dx) (a) 2., 71.47 (1dx) (b) (intro.), 71.47 (1dx) (c), 71.47 (1dx) (d), 71.49 (1) (f), 71.88 (2) (b), 79.10 (11) (b), 238.23 (2) (b), 238.398 (2) (b), 632.897 (10) (a) 3., 767.511 (1) (b), 767.804 (3) (c), 767.805 (4) (c) and 767.89 (3) (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the repeal of obsolete tax credits.
Title
The repeal of obsolete tax credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Published 2-5-2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 127 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-28 | Senate | LRB correction |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Representative Ramthun added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Revenue |
2021-09-24 | Senate | Introduced |