WI SB565 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 16.843 (1) (b) and 16.843 (3) (intro.) of the statutes; relating to: parking on the streets adjacent to the state capitol park.
Title
Parking on the streets adjacent to the state capitol park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-07 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-07 | Report passage recommended by committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-26 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ethics Reform and Government Operations | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb565 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB565.pdf |