WI SB563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 941.29 (1g) (a) and 971.17 (1g); to amend 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1g) (ah), 941.29 (1m) (ag), 941.29 (1m) (cm), 971.17 (1g) (b) and 973.136 of the statutes; Relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
The possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb563 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB563.pdf |