WI SB550 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Published 4-18-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Published 4-18-2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 321.60 (3) (c); to amend 321.60 (1) (c), 321.60 (2), 321.60 (3) (intro.), 321.60 (3) (a), 321.60 (3) (b), 321.60 (4) and 321.60 (5); and to create 321.60 (2m) and 440.09 of the statutes; relating to: professional or occupational licensure renewal requirements for active duty service members and their spouses and requirements concerning licensure in this state of spouses of service members temporarily stationed in this state. (FE)
Title
Professional or occupational licensure renewal requirements for active duty service members and their spouses and requirements concerning licensure in this state of spouses of service members temporarily stationed in this state. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Senate | Published 4-18-2012 |
2012-04-05 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2012. 2011 Wisconsin Act 210 |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-3-2012 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled on 3-21-2012 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2012-03-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-15 | House | Read a second time |
2012-03-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:35 A.M. on 3-14-2012 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 24 |
2012-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the calendar of 03-13-2012 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senators Lassa, Miller, Risser, Shilling, King, C. Larson, Vinehout, Taylor and Hansen |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Read a second time |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-13-2012 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Report passage recommended by committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Introduced |