WI SB540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.41 (2) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: payments to certain state veterans organizations. (FE)
Title
Payments to certain state veterans organizations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Representative Plumer added as a cosponsor |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation, Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb540 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB540.pdf |