WI SB535 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-15 - Published 4-16-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 895.508 of the statutes; Relating to: liability exemption for the provision of previously owned eyeglasses.
Title
Liability exemption for the provision of previously owned eyeglasses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-15 | Senate | Published 4-16-2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 4-15-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 257 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 4-14-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:21 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Representative Goyke added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Representative Knodl added as a cosponsor |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Introduced |