WI SB529 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.07 (6e) (b) and 71.07 (6e) (c) 3.; and to create 71.07 (6e) (a) 6. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing renters to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Title
Allowing renters to claim the veterans and surviving spouses property tax credit. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Representative Billings added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Universities and Revenue |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Introduced |