WI SB5 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Representative Steffen added as a cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 103.375 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting mandatory vaccination for employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting mandatory vaccination for employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19SenateRepresentative Steffen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-09SenateRepresentative Cabral-Guevara added as a cosponsor
2021-03-05SenateRepresentative Wichgers added as a cosponsor
2021-03-04SenateRepresentative Allen added as a cosponsor
2021-03-02SenateRepresentatives Edming and Tittl added as cosponsors
2021-02-26SenateRepresentative Ramthun added as a cosponsor
2021-01-22SenateAvailable for scheduling
2021-01-22SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2021-01-21SenateExecutive action taken
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing held
2021-01-15SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families
2021-01-15SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback