WI SB47 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-2-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 6.86 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: responding to a request for an absentee ballot.
Title
Responding to a request for an absentee ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-2-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-1-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 209 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-10 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-08-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-08-25 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2015-04-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a third time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-21-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Elections and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Harsdorf |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Elections and Local Government |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |