WI SB454 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: establishing a deer hunting season for certain persons serving on active duty in the U.S. armed forces or national guard.
Title
Establishing a deer hunting season for certain persons serving on active duty in the U.S. armed forces or national guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-14 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-12 | Representative Nerison added as a cosponsor | |
2010-01-11 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb454 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB454.pdf |