WI SB443 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: establishing a task force to study the legal and societal barriers to equality for transgender, intersex, nonbinary, and gender nonconforming individuals. (FE)
Title
Establishing a task force to study the legal and societal barriers to equality for transgender, intersex, nonbinary, and gender nonconforming individuals. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-08-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-20 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Introduced |