WI SB443 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.707 (1); and to create 229.682 (9) of the statutes; Relating to: lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)
Title
Lease terms and the imposition of sales and use taxes related to a local professional baseball park district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Senator Larson added as a coauthor |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Revenue, Financial Institutions and Rural Issues |
2017-10-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb443 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/SB443.pdf |