WI SB429 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Published 3-12-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 341.135; to amend 341.12 (4) (a), 341.16 (1) (a) and 341.16 (2); and to create 341.12 (4) (am), 341.135 (2), 341.135 (3) and 341.16 (2s) of the statutes; Relating to: construction and issuance of motor vehicle registration plates. (FE)
Title
Construction and issuance of motor vehicle registration plates. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Published 3-12-2022 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 3-11-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 163 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 3-10-2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 95, Noes 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:13 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 30, Noes 2 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-15-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduced |