WI SB421 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 19.365; to renumber and amend 19.36 (7) (a); to amend 19.32 (intro.), 19.32 (1), 19.32 (1m), 19.32 (2), 19.33 (1) to (3) and (8), 19.34 (title), 19.35 (1) (am) (intro.), 19.35 (1) (b), 19.35 (1) (c), 19.35 (1) (d), 19.35 (6) and 19.36 (13); and to create 19.32 (1bd) and 19.32 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: access to public records (suggested as remedial legislation by the Legislative Reference Bureau).
Title
Access to public records (suggested as remedial legislation by the Legislative Reference Bureau).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb421 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/SB421.pdf |