WI SB414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (56), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. L., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. L., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 119.23 (2) (a) 9. and 121.02 (1) (k) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Title
Incorporating cursive writing into the state model English language arts standards and requiring cursive writing in elementary grades. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Representative Brostoff withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Representative Pronschinske added as a cosponsor |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Representative Vruwink withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Representative Edming added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Representative Wichgers added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb414 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB414.pdf |