WI SB408 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 941.29 (4); to renumber 175.35 (2g) (b); to renumber and amend 175.35 (3); to amend 48.57 (3p) (g) 2., 165.63 (4) (a), 813.1285 (3) (a) 1. d., 813.1285 (4) (b) 1. (intro.), 813.1285 (7) (b), 941.29 (1g) (a), 973.12 and 976.05 (12); and to create 175.35 (2g) (b) 2., 175.35 (3) (b), 175.35 (4), 939.46 (3), 939.6195 and 941.2905 of the statutes; Relating to: furnishing, purchasing, or possessing a firearm for a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm, mandatory minimum sentences for individuals who commit certain firearm violations, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Furnishing, purchasing, or possessing a firearm for a person who is prohibited from possessing a firearm, mandatory minimum sentences for individuals who commit certain firearm violations, and providing criminal penalties. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenatePublished 3-29-2018
2018-03-28SenateReport approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 145
2018-03-26SenatePresented to the Governor on 3-26-2018
2018-03-22SenateRepresentative Barca added as a cosponsor
2018-03-02SenateReport correctly enrolled
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly concurred in
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseRead a third time and concurred in
2018-02-22HouseRules suspended
2018-02-22HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-22HouseRead a second time
2018-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 1:43 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27
2018-02-20HouseRead first time and referred to committee on Rules
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 13
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators L. Taylor, Bewley, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Johnson, Schachtner and Shilling
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2017-11-17SenateRepresentative Krug added as a cosponsor
2017-11-08SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-10-24SenateAvailable for scheduling
2017-10-24SenateReport passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2
2017-10-24SenateExecutive action taken
2017-10-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-10-20SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-10-19SenatePublic hearing held
2017-10-05SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-09-14SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-09-14SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback