WI SB395 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on February 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-07 - Published 2-5-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 46.90 (5) (b) (intro.), 55.043 (1r) (a) 1g. and 55.043 (1r) (b) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: responses to reports relating to elder adults at risk and adults at risk.
Title
Responses to reports relating to elder adults at risk and adults at risk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Published 2-5-2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-4-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 122 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-1-2022 by directive of the Majority Leader |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-01-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Read a second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a cosponsor |
2021-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-10-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-25-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Human Services, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Jacque |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Human Services, Children and Families |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |