WI SB380 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 941.29 (2); to renumber 971.17 (1g); to renumber and amend 941.29 (1); to amend 938.396 (2g) (d), 941.29 (3), 941.29 (4), 941.29 (5) (intro.), 941.29 (5) (a), 941.29 (8), 941.29 (9), 941.29 (10) (intro.) and 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1c), 941.29 (1m) (ag), 941.29 (1m) (cm), 971.17 (1g) (b) and 973.136 of the statutes; relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty.
Title
The possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate amendment 2 offered by Senator Taylor | |
2010-02-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-05 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties received | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing held | |
2010-02-03 | Senate amendment 1 offered by Senator Taylor | |
2009-12-07 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-12-02 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties requested pursuant to s. 13.525 (5) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2009-11-19 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-18 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-18 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-11-03 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-11-03 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb380 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/SB380.pdf |