WI SB376 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.255 (2) (aq) and 115.437; to consolidate, renumber and amend 121.15 (1m) (a) (intro.) and 3.; to amend 20.255 (2) (ac), 79.10 (4), 79.10 (5m), 79.14, 79.15, 121.004 (7) (a), 121.07 (6) (d), 121.105 (2) (am) 1., 121.105 (2) (am) 2. (intro.), 121.15 (3m) (a) 2., 121.90 (2) (am) 1., 121.905 (1), 121.905 (3) (c) 6., 121.91 (2m) (i) (intro.), 121.91 (2m) (r) 1. (intro.), 121.91 (2m) (r) 1. b., 121.91 (2m) (s) 1. (intro.), 121.91 (2m) (s) 1. b. and 121.91 (2m) (t) 1. (intro.); and to create 20.255 (2) (bg), 121.004 (7) (g), 121.10, 121.105 (5), 121.136 (3), 121.15 (3m), 121.905 (3) (c) 7., 121.905 (3) (c) 8., 121.91 (2m) (im) and 121.91 (2m) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: counting low-income pupils for state school aid purposes; calculating the amount to be appropriated for state general school aid; school aid factors; special adjustment aids; hold harmless aid; per pupil aid; school district revenue limits; the first dollar and school levy property tax credits; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Counting low-income pupils for state school aid purposes; calculating the amount to be appropriated for state general school aid; school aid factors; special adjustment aids; hold harmless aid; per pupil aid; school district revenue limits; the first dollar and school levy property tax credits; and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb376 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB376.pdf |