WI SB361 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.370 (1) (mu), 281.61 (6) and 292.31 (1) (d) (intro.); and to create 20.285 (1) (as), 20.370 (4) (az), 20.370 (4) (pr), 20.370 (4) (ps), 20.370 (6) (ed), 20.370 (6) (ee), 25.17 (1) (kt), 25.461, 36.50, 160.07 (7), 160.15 (4), 227.139 (5), 281.15 (5m), 281.17 (8) (c), 281.79, 285.27 (2) (bm), 292.31 (1) (d) 1m., 292.31 (11), 292.66, 292.67, 292.74, 299.15 (2m), 299.48 (1) (am), 299.48 (1) (e), 299.48 (3d), 299.48 (3m) (c) and 299.485 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating and addressing PFAS, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Regulating and addressing PFAS, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Refused to withdraw from the committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Refused to withdraw from the committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 11, Noes 19 |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Representative Goyke added as a cosponsor |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Representative Hintz added as a cosponsor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced |