WI SB329 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.23 (1) (a) (intro.), 40.23 (1) (am) 2., 40.23 (1) (bm), 40.24 (1) (f), 40.25 (2), 40.63 (4) and 40.63 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the minimum retirement age under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Title
Increasing the minimum retirement age under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Report of Joint Survey Committee on Retirement Systems requested |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Government Reform |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb329 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB329.pdf |