WI SB320 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 104.01 (2) (b) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: exemption of outside salespersons from the minimum wage law.
Title
Exemption of outside salespersons from the minimum wage law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-05 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and passed (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2013-11-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-10-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-10-25 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-10-02 | Senate | Introduced |