WI SB31 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 118.43 (2) (g); and to create 118.43 (2) (f) and 118.43 (2) (g) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: a one-year extension of student achievement guarantee in education program contracts. (FE)
Title
A one-year extension of student achievement guarantee in education program contracts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb31 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB31.pdf |