WI SB300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Received from Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: establishing a tick-borne disease study committee. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a tick-borne disease study committee. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08HouseReceived from Senate
2019-10-08SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2019-10-08SenateSenator Bewley added as a coauthor
2019-10-08SenateRead a third time and passed
2019-10-08SenateRules suspended
2019-10-08SenateOrdered to a third reading
2019-10-08SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2019-10-08SenateRead a second time
2019-10-04SenatePlaced on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-09-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-19SenateReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-19SenateReport adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0
2019-09-18SenateExecutive action taken
2019-09-16SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Cowles and Miller
2019-09-03SenatePublic hearing held
2019-07-24SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-06-25SenateFiscal estimate received
2019-06-24SenateRepresentative Rohrkaste added as a cosponsor
2019-06-21SenateRead first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2019-06-21SenateIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback