WI SB30 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.336 (2) (b) and 29.336 (2) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: restrictions on baiting deer in counties based on chronic wasting disease or bovine tuberculosis.
Title
Restrictions on baiting deer in counties based on chronic wasting disease or bovine tuberculosis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Introduced |