WI SB297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 234.045 (1) (intro.), 234.045 (1) (a), 234.045 (2) (a) 2., 234.045 (2) (a) 3., 234.045 (2) (b), 234.53 (2), 234.53 (2m), 234.53 (4) and 234.53 (5); and to create 234.045 (2) (a) 4. to 6. and 234.53 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: housing rehabilitation loans awarded by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Title
Housing rehabilitation loans awarded by the Wisconsin Housing and Economic Development Authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Representative Subeck added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Laid on table |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 11th order of business on the calendar of 6-14-2023 |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Senators Taylor and Spreitzer added as coauthors |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Representatives Jacobson, Cabrera, Conley and Haywood added as cosponsors |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Fiscal estimate requested from the Legislative Fiscal Bureau, pursuant to Senate Rule 96 (1) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Representative Bare added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Representative Snodgrass added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Stroebel |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Representative Magnafici added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing, Rural Issues and Forestry |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |