WI SB291 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 19.36 (14), 66.0512 and 940.20 (4m) of the statutes; Relating to: an election official's personal information, battery against election officials, whistleblower protection for municipal clerks, county clerks, and election officials who witness and report election fraud or irregularities, and providing a penalty.
Title
An election official's personal information, battery against election officials, whistleblower protection for municipal clerks, county clerks, and election officials who witness and report election fraud or irregularities, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-03-18 | House | Representative Andraca added as a cosponsor |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-03-14 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug |
2023-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2023-10-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-10-04 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-09-26 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Representative Krug added as a cosponsor |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections and Consumer Protection |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Introduced |