WI SB285 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 230.16 (7m) (c), 230.16 (9), 230.19 (2), 230.19 (3), 230.25 (1g), 230.25 (1m), 230.28 (1) (b), 230.28 (6), 230.31 (2) and 230.40 (3); to renumber 230.19 (1); to renumber and amend 230.01 (2), 230.16 (7), 230.34 (1) (a) and 230.43 (1) (a); to amend 62.13 (4) (d), 63.08 (1) (f) 1., 63.08 (1) (f) 2., 63.08 (1) (f) 3., 63.37, 63.39 (2m), 66.0509 (1), 230.04 (14), 230.05 (7), 230.08 (2) (c), 230.12 (1) (h), 230.13 (1) (a), 230.13 (3) (b), 230.15 (1), 230.15 (1m) (c) 1., 230.16 (title), 230.16 (1) (a), 230.16 (2), 230.16 (3), 230.16 (4), 230.16 (5), 230.16 (6), 230.16 (7m) (b) 4., 230.16 (10), 230.16 (11), 230.17 (1), 230.17 (2), 230.18, 230.21 (1), 230.21 (2), 230.21 (3), 230.213, 230.24 (1), 230.24 (2), 230.25 (1), 230.25 (1n) (a) (intro.), 230.25 (2) (a), 230.25 (2) (b), 230.25 (3) (a), 230.26 (2), 230.26 (4), 230.28 (1) (a), 230.28 (1) (am), 230.28 (1) (c), 230.31 (1) (intro.), 230.34 (1) (am), 230.34 (2) (a), 230.34 (2) (b), 230.35 (3) (d), 230.37 (1), 230.43 (1) (title), 230.43 (1) (b), 230.43 (1) (c), 230.43 (1) (d), 230.43 (1) (e), 230.43 (5), 230.44 (1) (c), 230.44 (1) (e) and 321.65 (3) (g); to create 20.865 (1) (dm), 20.928 (1f), 230.01 (2) (bm), 230.01 (2) (bp), 230.04 (13m), 230.04 (19), 230.06 (1) (m), 230.06 (4), 230.13 (3) (c), 230.15 (6), 230.15 (7), 230.16 (1) (ap), 230.25 (2) (am), 230.31 (3), 230.34 (1) (a) 1. to 9. and 230.445 of the statutes; and to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9101 (5n) (a) and 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9101 (5n) (b); Relating to: the state civil service and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The state civil service and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Laid on table |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Report introduction and adoption of Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Senate Organization and rereferred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators C. Larson and Wirch |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senators C. Larson and Wirch |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Nass |
2015-10-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Roth |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-10-02 | Senate | Representative Loudenbeck added as a cosponsor |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Representative Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Government Reform |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb285 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/SB285.pdf |