WI SB276 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: the sale of White Mound County Park to Sauk County.
Title
The sale of White Mound County Park to Sauk County.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Dave Considine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 56 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Introduced |