WI SB276 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 125.51 (4) (v) 1.; and to create 125.51 (4) (v) 1. a. of the statutes; relating to: municipal quotas for retail intoxicating liquor licenses. (FE)
Title
Municipal quotas for retail intoxicating liquor licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Rep. Roger Rivard [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Gordon Hintz [D] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2011-12-06 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Small Business, and Tourism |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb276 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/SB276.pdf |