WI SB257 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Published 8-3-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 29.184 (6) (b) 1. and 2.; and to renumber and amend 29.184 (6) (b) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: the cumulative preference system for issuing Class A bear hunting licenses. (FE)
Title
The cumulative preference system for issuing Class A bear hunting licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | Published 8-3-2017 |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 8-2-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 44 |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 8-1-2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Representatives Spreitzer and Barca added as cosponsors |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Introduced |