WI SB253 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: a tier I license issued by the Department of Public Instruction and modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Public Instruction.
Title
A tier I license issued by the Department of Public Instruction and modifying administrative rules promulgated by the Department of Public Instruction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-11-14 | Senate | Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Senate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator James |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Introduced |