WI SB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.0602 (3) (e) 10. of the statutes; Relating to: exception from local levy limits for political subdivisions receiving certain utility aid payments. (FE)
Title
Exception from local levy limits for political subdivisions receiving certain utility aid payments. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/sen/bill/sb251 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/SB251.pdf |