WI SB251 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 14.86 (1) (b) and (c) of the statutes; Relating to: terms of office for members of the Midwest Interstate Passenger Rail Commission.
Title
Terms of office for members of the Midwest Interstate Passenger Rail Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Lazich [R] | Sen. Mark Miller [D] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 182 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-01-13 | House | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2016-01-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-10 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Public Benefit and Regulatory Reform |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Introduced |